TX HB249 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to investigations of child abuse, neglect, or exploitation and to child protective services functions of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to investigations of child abuse, neglect, or exploitation and to child protective services functions of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1868 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#563 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#563 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-02-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety