TX HB2483 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to utility facilities for restoring electric service after a widespread power outage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to utility facilities for restoring electric service after a widespread power outage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1734 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#375 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1734
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-28SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-27SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-27SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-27HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateAmended
2021-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-21SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#375
2021-04-21HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-20HouseAmended 3-Patterson
2021-04-20HouseAmended 2-Patterson
2021-04-20HouseAmended 1-P. King
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-16HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-16HouseRead first time
2021-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2483
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02483I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02483H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02483E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02483S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02483F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02483H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02483H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02483H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02483S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02483I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02483H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02483H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02483E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02483E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02483F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2483&RcdVtNo=375&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=49
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2483&RcdVtNo=1734&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=119

Bill Comments 750

feedback