TX HB2469 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the management, breeding, and destruction of deer and to procedures regarding certain deer permits.
Title
Relating to the management, breeding, and destruction of deer and to procedures regarding certain deer permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2013-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ANIMAL HEALTH COMMISSION, TEXAS
Animals
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
PERMITS
Animals
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
PERMITS