TX HB2467 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to excluding certain premiums, revenues, and fees from the determination of certain insurers' taxable gross premiums or revenues; affecting certain taxes.
Title
Relating to excluding certain premiums, revenues, and fees from the determination of certain insurers' taxable gross premiums or revenues; affecting certain taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |