TX HB2467 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the definition of playgrounds and to including those playgrounds in the designation of certain places as drug-free zones for purposes of criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to the definition of playgrounds and to including those playgrounds in the designation of certain places as drug-free zones for purposes of criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-17 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-17 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1531 (Same As) 2009-05-07 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar