TX HB2458 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation and administration of the Texas Bullion Depository.
Title
Relating to the operation and administration of the Texas Bullion Depository.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#718 (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#718 (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#718 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended 1-Murr |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended 2-Murr |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended 1-Capriglione |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1692 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Open Records
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Open Records
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER