TX HB2433 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Zwiener |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |