TX HB2413 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain identifying information regarding career school or college students.
Title
Relating to certain identifying information regarding career school or college students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1524 (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#532 (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#503 (Y: 121 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#532 (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#503 (Y: 121 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-04-13 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information