TX HB2409 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing supplemental payment programs for the reimbursement of certain ambulance providers under Medicaid.
Title
Relating to establishing supplemental payment programs for the reimbursement of certain ambulance providers under Medicaid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2134 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
AMBULANCES
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2409 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02409I.htm |