TX HB2408 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - Subcommittee members named
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - Subcommittee members named
Summary
Relating to the extension of consumer credit to certain members of the Texas National Guard and armed forces of the United States and their dependents; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the extension of consumer credit to certain members of the Texas National Guard and armed forces of the United States and their dependents; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Chavez [D] | Rep. Joe Farias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB189 (Same As) 2009-05-15 - Reported favorably as substituted
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Financial
Financial--General
Military & Veterans
PAYDAY LOANS
Business & Commerce--General
Financial
Financial--General
Military & Veterans
PAYDAY LOANS