TX HB2406 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the qualifications of experts in certain health care liability claims.
Title
Relating to the qualifications of experts in certain health care liability claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#661 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#661 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1106 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
CHIROPRACTIC & CHIROPRACTORS
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
EVIDENCE
Health Care Providers
Malpractice
Malpractice--Professionals
PHYSICIANS
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
EVIDENCE
Health Care Providers
Malpractice
Malpractice--Professionals
PHYSICIANS