TX HB2403 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to removing gender restrictions in the "Romeo and Juliet" defense.
Title
Relating to removing gender restrictions in the "Romeo and Juliet" defense.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |