TX HB24 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to placement of a student in a disciplinary alternative education program for bullying or cyber-bullying.
Title
Relating to placement of a student in a disciplinary alternative education program for bullying or cyber-bullying.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |
Subjects
ALTERNATIVE EDUCATION PROGRAMS
BULLYING
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
HARASSMENT
BULLYING
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
HARASSMENT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB24 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00024I.htm |