TX HB2397 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the offense of breach of computer security.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the offense of breach of computer security.
Sponsors
Rep. Sid Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Protection of Personal Information
Science & Technology
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Protection of Personal Information
Science & Technology