TX HB2397 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Summary
Relating to requiring computer technicians to report images of child pornography; providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to requiring computer technicians to report images of child pornography; providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Eissler [R] | Rep. Patricia Harless [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Kristi Thibaut [D] |
Rep. Chris Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Electronic Information Systems
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PORNOGRAPHY
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Electronic Information Systems
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PORNOGRAPHY