TX HB2396 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eliminating requirements that certain public institutions of higher education set aside portions of tuition for student loan repayment programs for certain physicians and state attorneys.
Title
Relating to eliminating requirements that certain public institutions of higher education set aside portions of tuition for student loan repayment programs for certain physicians and state attorneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - HB 2396Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-09 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Lawyers
PHYSICIANS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Lawyers
PHYSICIANS