TX HB2394 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the compelled production of certain customer records by a financial institution.
Title
Relating to the compelled production of certain customer records by a financial institution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-16 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-16 | House | Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |