TX HB2391 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the redemption of certain stored value cards, including gift cards, for cash.
Title
Relating to the redemption of certain stored value cards, including gift cards, for cash.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - House - HB 2391Third Reading House (Y: 110 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |