TX HB2389 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Summary
Relating to supplemental breath alcohol testing court costs and the distribution of those costs in certain counties.
Title
Relating to supplemental breath alcohol testing court costs and the distribution of those costs in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-17 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID