TX HB238 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 95-4)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of "Choose Life" license plates and the creation of the Choose Life account in the general revenue fund.
Title
Relating to the issuance of "Choose Life" license plates and the creation of the Choose Life account in the general revenue fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-05-03 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-05-03 | Point of order overruled | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-09 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time | |
2010-11-10 | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
LICENSE PLATES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
LICENSE PLATES
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration