TX HB2367 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a prohibition on bids by certain insurance and health benefit providers to administer or provide coverage under certain group benefit plans for governmental employees.
Title
Relating to a prohibition on bids by certain insurance and health benefit providers to administer or provide coverage under certain group benefit plans for governmental employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1212 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1212 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-G. Bonnen |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Health Care Providers
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
PHYSICIANS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
State Employees
Health Care Providers
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
PHYSICIANS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
State Employees