TX HB2363 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to equal parenting orders in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to equal parenting orders in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-13HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2015-03-13HouseRead first time
2015-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback