TX HB2348 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to a contract between a water district and a municipality for the provision of fire-fighting services in certain counties.
Title
Relating to a contract between a water district and a municipality for the provision of fire-fighting services in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility