TX HB2344 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the commissioners court of a county to create a law enforcement technology fund and to require certain defendants to pay court costs for deposit in the fund.
Title
Relating to the authority of the commissioners court of a county to create a law enforcement technology fund and to require certain defendants to pay court costs for deposit in the fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-05-03 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
Courts
Courts--Administration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Law Enforcement
Science & Technology
County Government--Finance
Courts
Courts--Administration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Law Enforcement
Science & Technology
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB2344 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB02344I.htm |