TX HB233 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-02 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to providing accelerated instruction for public school students who fail to achieve satisfactory performance on certain assessment instruments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to providing accelerated instruction for public school students who fail to achieve satisfactory performance on certain assessment instruments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#153 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-02SenateReceived from the House
2021-09-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-09-02HouseRecord vote RV#153
2021-09-02HousePassed
2021-09-02HouseRead 3rd time
2021-09-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-09-02HouseAmended 2-K. Bell, VanDeaver, K. King, Allison, Dutton, Huberty, Buckley, Lozano, and M. González
2021-09-02HouseAmended 1-Huberty
2021-09-02HouseRead 2nd time
2021-09-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-09-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-09-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-08-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-08-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-08-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-08-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-26HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-08-26HouseRead first time
2021-08-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback