TX HB233 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the exception of certain information related to the humane disposition by a municipality or county of an animal from required disclosure under the public information law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the exception of certain information related to the humane disposition by a municipality or county of an animal from required disclosure under the public information law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback