TX HB233 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 11 2014 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to social work services in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to social work services in public schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-11HouseReferred to Public Education
2015-02-11HouseRead first time
2014-11-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback