TX HB233 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to establish and recommend qualifications for certain health care translators and interpreters.
Title
Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to establish and recommend qualifications for certain health care translators and interpreters.
Sponsors
Rep. Veronica Gonzales [D] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D] | Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D] |
Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-06 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-14 | Filed |
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
QUALIFICATIONS FOR HEALTH CARE TRANSLATORS & INTPRET, ADV CO
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
QUALIFICATIONS FOR HEALTH CARE TRANSLATORS & INTPRET, ADV CO
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed