TX HB2313 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training materials for certain transportation network company drivers regarding human trafficking awareness and prevention.
Title
Relating to training materials for certain transportation network company drivers regarding human trafficking awareness and prevention.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] | Rep. Maria Flores [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Rep. Mihaela Plesa [D] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1318 (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1318 (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1318 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1369 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1369 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1369 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crime Prevention
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
VEHICLES FOR HIRE
Crime Prevention
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
VEHICLES FOR HIRE