TX HB2313 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a required resource access assistance offer before an abortion is performed or induced.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a required resource access assistance offer before an abortion is performed or induced.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB802 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback