TX HB2305 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility for an exemption from ad valorem taxation for property used by certain nonprofit community business organizations.
Title
Relating to the eligibility for an exemption from ad valorem taxation for property used by certain nonprofit community business organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Business & Commerce--General
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB2305 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB02305I.htm |