TX HB2304 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the certification of sheriffs and deputy sheriffs to enforce commercial motor vehicle safety standards in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the certification of sheriffs and deputy sheriffs to enforce commercial motor vehicle safety standards in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | House | No action taken in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
MEXICO
SHERIFFS
UNITED MEXICAN STATES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MEXICO
SHERIFFS
UNITED MEXICAN STATES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration