TX HB2303 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of a bet for purposes of gambling criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of a bet for purposes of gambling criminal offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#881 (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#854 (Y: 116 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#881
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HouseRecord vote RV#854
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-01HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-01HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Nevárez
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback