TX HB23 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a grant program to fund innovative programs for public school students with autism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a grant program to fund innovative programs for public school students with autism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#71 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#37 (Y: 137 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-07HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-07HouseRecord vote
2017-08-07HousePassed
2017-08-07HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-08-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-02HouseRecord vote
2017-08-02HouseCalendars Committee rule adopted
2017-08-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback