TX HB2286 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the payment of fees and costs associated with driver education and safety courses and driver's license examinations for foster children or youth, former foster children or youth, and youth experiencing homelessness.
Title
Relating to the payment of fees and costs associated with driver education and safety courses and driver's license examinations for foster children or youth, former foster children or youth, and youth experiencing homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2054 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Family
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HOMELESS
Legislature
Minors
Minors--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Driver Education & Training
Family
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HOMELESS
Legislature
Minors
Minors--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS