TX HB2277 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to life settlements and the sale, exchange, or replacement of life insurance and annuity contracts.
Title
Relating to life settlements and the sale, exchange, or replacement of life insurance and annuity contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-26 | Record vote | |
2011-05-26 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-26 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-21 | Returned to the Senate for further action | |
2011-05-21 | Senate adopts resolution recalling from House | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-16 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Passed | |
2011-05-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-16 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-05-03 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-14 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Insurance
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Insurance
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING