TX HB2263 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of electric power to certain public customers.
Title
Relating to the sale of electric power to certain public customers.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Dade Phelan [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] |
Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#255 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#255 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2019-05-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#255 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2116 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--School Districts
GENERAL LAND OFFICE COMMISSIONER
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Education--School Districts
GENERAL LAND OFFICE COMMISSIONER
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric