TX HB2257 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to mandatory sales price disclosure in certain real property sales; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to mandatory sales price disclosure in certain real property sales; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-16 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |