TX HB2252 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the feasibility of creating and maintaining a coastal barrier system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the feasibility of creating and maintaining a coastal barrier system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-08HouseRules suspended
2017-04-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback