TX HB2242 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to illness or injury leave of absence for county and municipal firefighters, police officers, and emergency medical services personnel.
Title
Relating to illness or injury leave of absence for county and municipal firefighters, police officers, and emergency medical services personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Mary Perez [D] |
Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#961 (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#961 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Patterson |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
SICK LEAVE
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
SICK LEAVE