TX HB2230 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the determination of the sufficient balance of the economic stabilization fund for the purpose of allocating general revenue to that fund and the state highway fund.
Title
Relating to the determination of the sufficient balance of the economic stabilization fund for the purpose of allocating general revenue to that fund and the state highway fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1803 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#915 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#915 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-17 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1803 |
2023-05-17 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#915 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2023-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/4/23 10:00 AM |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB225 (Same As) 2023-02-22 - Co-author authorized
SB225 (Same As) 2023-02-22 - Co-author authorized
SB1232 (Similar To) 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB225 (Same As) 2023-02-22 - Co-author authorized
SB1232 (Similar To) 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar