TX HB2227 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the chief appraiser of an appraisal district to correct an ad valorem tax appraisal roll.
Title
Relating to the authority of the chief appraiser of an appraisal district to correct an ad valorem tax appraisal roll.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-09 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2227 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02227I.htm |