TX HB2221 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to mobile source emissions reductions and transportation electrification; authorizing a surcharge.
Title
Relating to mobile source emissions reductions and transportation electrification; authorizing a surcharge.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] |
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION, TEXAS STATE
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HYBRID VEHICLES
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
TRANSPORTATION ELECTRIFICATION COUNCIL, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HYBRID VEHICLES
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
TRANSPORTATION ELECTRIFICATION COUNCIL, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General