TX HB2221 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a single Internet portal through which Medicaid providers may submit and receive information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a single Internet portal through which Medicaid providers may submit and receive information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2086 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Referred to Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback