TX HB2221 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procedures for municipal annexations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procedures for municipal annexations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-14HouseReturned to committee
2015-05-14HousePoint of order sustained
2015-05-14HouseAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2015-05-14HouseAmendment amended
2015-05-14HouseAmendment amended
2015-05-14HouseVote reconsidered
2015-05-14HouseAmended
2015-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-16HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-13HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2015-03-13HouseRead first time
2015-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback