TX HB2213 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dissolution of the Falls County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Title
Relating to the dissolution of the Falls County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-19 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FALLS COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2213 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02213I.htm |