TX HB2207 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the foreclosure sale of property subject to an oil or gas lease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the foreclosure sale of property subject to an oil or gas lease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-04 - House - HB 2207Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - SUSPEND ALL NECESSARY RULES (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-15 Effective on 1/1/16
2015-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-20SenateRecord vote
2015-05-20SenatePassed
2015-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-20SenateRecord vote
2015-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-05SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2015-05-05SenateRead first time
2015-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-04HouseRecord vote
2015-05-04HousePassed
2015-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-30HouseRecord vote
2015-04-30HouseRules suspended
2015-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-16HouseReferred to Energy Resources
2015-03-16HouseRead first time
2015-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback