TX HB2205 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to applicability of the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code to certain pools, spas, and other swimming areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to applicability of the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code to certain pools, spas, and other swimming areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1680 (Y: 132 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#542 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Filed without the Governor's signature
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1680
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#542
2021-04-29HousePassed
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2205
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02205I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02205H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02205E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02205S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02205F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02205I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02205H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02205H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02205E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02205E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02205S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02205S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02205F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2205&RcdVtNo=542&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2205&RcdVtNo=1680&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=235

Bill Comments 750

feedback