TX HB22 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school accountability.
Title
Relating to public school accountability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#2049 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#752 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Amendment tabled RV#751 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#2049 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#752 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Amendment tabled RV#751 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2017-05-29 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2017-05-28 | House | Objections withdrawn |
2017-05-28 | House | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education--School Districts