TX HB2199 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1756 (Y: 117 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1756 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |